Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1123664 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2004 | B1 | EP1123664 | 16.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00102712 | 09.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE282969T | 15.12.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP00102712 | 09.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50008746D1 | 30.12.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP00102712 | 09.02.2000 |