EP1123664 - Device for conditioning of fodder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/33] | Device for treating solid materials | ||
[2004/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amandus Kahl GmbH & Co. Dieselstrasse 5-9 21465 Reinbek / DE | [2001/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behrmann, Joachim Hochweg 26 D-21465 Wentorf / DE | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00102712.7 | 09.02.2000 | [2001/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1123664 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123664 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A23N17/00, B30B11/22 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
B30B11/225 (EP);
A23N17/004 (EP);
A23P30/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Konditionieren von Futtermitteln | [2004/23] | English: | Device for conditioning of fodder | [2004/23] | French: | Dispositif pour le conditionnement du fourrage | [2004/23] |
Former [2001/33] | Vorrichtung zum Behandeln von Feststoffen | ||
Former [2001/33] | Device for treating solid materials | ||
Former [2001/33] | Dispositif pour le traitement des matériaux solides | Examination procedure | 23.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 19.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.11.2004 | FR | 24.11.2004 | GB | 24.11.2004 | IE | 24.11.2004 | IT | 24.11.2004 | NL | 24.11.2004 | AT | 09.02.2005 | CY | 09.02.2005 | LU | 09.02.2005 | DK | 24.02.2005 | GR | 24.02.2005 | SE | 24.02.2005 | BE | 28.02.2005 | CH | 28.02.2005 | LI | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | ES | 06.03.2005 | PT | 24.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
IT | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
AT | 09.02.2005 | ||
CY | 09.02.2005 | ||
LU | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
AT | 09.02.2005 | ||
CY | 09.02.2005 | ||
LU | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
AT | 09.02.2005 | ||
LU | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
AT | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
GB | 24.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 24.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR633320 (ANDERSON CO V D) [Y] 1-7,9-11 * page 1, line 1 - line 30 * * page 1, line 58 - page 2, line 11 * * page 2, line 77 - line 87 * * page 3, line 32 - line 42 * * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 8 * * page 4, line 46 - line 49 * * page 5, line 29 - line 43 * * page 5, line 78 - page 6, line 20 * * figures 1,3-11,13,16-19 *; | [A]GB1109341 (BAUER BROS CO) [A] 1 * page 1, line 40 - line 58 * * page 2, line 57 - line 69 * * page 2, line 99 - line 116 ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2658393 (MECCANICA SRL [IT]) [A] 1,8 * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * page 2, line 5 - line 8 * * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 25 * * figures 2,4 *; | [DY]DE19714713 (KAHL AMANDUS MASCHF [DE]) [DY] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19714713 |