EP1030398 - Gel electrolyte and gel electrolyte battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | 01.09.2006 | Correction of patent specification | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibuya, Mashio c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Goto, Shuji c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00102764.8 | 10.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | JP19990041456 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4145699 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030398 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1030398 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1030398 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/40, H01M6/22 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
H01M6/22 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/19] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gelartiger Elektrolyt und Batterie mit gelartigem Elektrolyten | [2005/17] | English: | Gel electrolyte and gel electrolyte battery | [2000/34] | French: | Electrolyte gélifié et batterie à électrolyte gélifié | [2000/34] |
Former [2000/34] | Gelartiges Elektrolyt und Batterie mit gelartigen Elektrolyten | Examination procedure | 23.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 21.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05010960.2 / EP1619734 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH117981 ; | [A]EP0724305 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0746050 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 5,10 * page 8, lines 20-30 * * page 10, lines 11-15; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0862232 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * page 17; example 1 ** page 20; example 4 *; | [X]EP0892452 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 5; tables 5,6,10 * * claims 19-24 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11007981 A 19990112 (NEC CORP) [A] 3,8 * abstract * |