EP1027834 - Food composition comprising L-arginine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.10.2005 | New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.10.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University 900 Welch Road Suite 350 Stanford California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of The Leland Stanford Junior University 900 Welch Road, Suite 350 Stanford, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooke, John P. 4022 Ben Lomond Drive Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
Gibbons, Gary H. 3212 Morris Drive Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 03 /
Dzau, Victor J. 12101 Dawn Lane Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00102776.2 | 02.06.1994 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | US19930076312 | 11.06.1993 Original published format: US 76312 | US19940184519 | 21.01.1994 Original published format: US 184519 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027834 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/305, A61K31/195 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
C12N9/0044 (EP);
A23L33/175 (EP);
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K38/44 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | L-Arginin enthaltende Nahrungsmittelzusammensetzung | [2000/33] | English: | Food composition comprising L-arginine | [2000/33] | French: | Composition alimentaire contenant de l'arginine | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/48] | 13.10.2005 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.10.2005 | 25.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94918203.4 / EP0702518 | Request for further processing for: | 14.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2005 | Decision despatched | 24.05.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 24.05.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0511587 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, lines 5-10 * * page 3, lines 30-48 * * page 4, lines 7-20; examples 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]US4900566 (HOWARD ALAN N [GB]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * column 7, line 36 - column 9, line 10; claims 1,2,10 *; | [X]US5106836 (CLEMENS ROGER D [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 1, lines 54-68 * * column 4, lines 14-18 * * column 10, lines 32-45; claims 1-4,7; tables 1,2 *; | [X]JPS6094075 ; | [X]JPS61215323 ; | [X]JPS61254162 ; | [X]JPS6049764 ; | [X]JPS59210872 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850924), vol. 009, no. 237, Database accession no. (C - 305), & JP60094075 A 19850527 (AJINOMOTO KK) [X] 1,5,6,10 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 45, Database accession no. 1986-294476, XP002138787 & JPS61215323 A 19860925 (OTSUKA PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870403), vol. 011, no. 106, Database accession no. (C - 414), & JP61254162 A 19861111 (KAMEHIKO MOGI;OTHERS: 04) [X] 1,6 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 17, Database accession no. 1985-103114, XP002138788 & JPS6049764 A 19850313 (AJINOMOTO KK) [X] 1,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850406), vol. 009, no. 078, Database accession no. (C - 274), & JP59210872 A 19841129 (AJINOMOTO KK) [X] 1,6 * abstract * |