Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4004067B | Global Dossier | 07.11.2007 | B2 | JPH11514936 | 21.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | US9613941 | 30.08.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1005957 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2003 | B1 | EP1005957 | 05.12.2001 | A3 | EP1005957 | 07.06.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | EP96929809 | 30.08.1996 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0847322 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2001 | B1 | EP0847322 | 17.06.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | US9613941 | 30.08.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6906896 | Global Dossier | 19.03.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | US9613941 | 30.08.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1008420 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2003 | B1 | EP1008420 | 05.12.2001 | A3 | EP1008420 | 14.06.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | EP96929809 | 30.08.1996 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9609860 | 16.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | US9613941 | 30.08.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2229810 | 06.03.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | US9613941 | 30.08.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29623899U | 27.07.2000 | U1 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | EP96929809 | 30.08.1996 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69612387T | 09.08.2001 | T2 | DE69612387D1 | 10.05.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | US9613941 | 30.08.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI980432 | 25.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | US9613941 | 30.08.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5712210 | 27.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US75512096 | 22.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6207246 | 27.03.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US44784399 | 23.11.1999 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | US10487198 | 25.06.1998 | US84755197 | 23.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9707937 | Global Dossier | 05.06.1997 | A3 | WO9707937 | 06.03.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69628949T | 13.05.2004 | T2 | DE69628949D1 | 07.08.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69628950T | 13.05.2004 | T2 | DE69628950D1 | 07.08.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2198236T | 01.02.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2198237T | 01.02.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19990044244 | 25.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9801600 | 30.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US52095495 | 30.08.1995 | US58610296 | 16.01.1996 | Type | Earlier application | EP0847322 |