EP1008420 - Nonwoven abrasive material roll [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barnard, C., Mathew, c/o Minn. Mining & Manuf. Co. 3M Center, POBox 33427, Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Hanf, Charlie, A. c/o Minn. Mining & Manuf. Co. 3M Center, POBox 33427, Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Moren, Louis, S. c/o Minn. Mining & Manuf. Co. 3M Center, POBox 33427, Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
Spencer, Douglas, S. c/o Minn. Mining & Manuf. Co. 3M Center, POBox 33427, Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
Windisch, Laurie, A. c/o Minn. Mining & Manuf. Co. 3M Center, POBox 33427, Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103427.1 | 30.08.1996 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | US19950520954 | 30.08.1995 Original published format: US 520954 | US19960586102 | 16.01.1996 Original published format: US 586102 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1008420 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1008420 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008420 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B24D11/00, B24D15/04, A47L13/17 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
D04H1/413 (EP);
B24D11/00 (KR);
A47L13/07 (EP);
A47L13/17 (EP);
A47L17/08 (EP);
B24D11/008 (EP);
B24D15/04 (EP);
B24D3/28 (EP);
B65H18/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/24] | Title | German: | Schleifvliesmaterialrolle | [2003/27] | English: | Nonwoven abrasive material roll | [2000/24] | French: | Rouleau de matériau abrasif non tissé | [2000/24] |
Former [2000/24] | Schleifvliesstoffrolle | Examination procedure | 25.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 21.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96929809.0 / EP0847322 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4227350 (FITZER ROBERT C) [DA] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]DE8512084U (MARIA SCHEEPE) [A] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0287286 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 6 * page 5, line 17 - line 20 *; | [A]EP0480848 (GRANGER MAURICE [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figure - *; | [A]US3688453 (LEGACY LLOYD W, et al) [A] 6 * column 4, line 25 - line 48 * |