Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4056029B | Global Dossier | 05.03.2008 | B2 | JP2000233796 | 29.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP3989999 | 18.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1029782 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2004 | B1 | EP1029782 | 05.06.2002 | A3 | EP1029782 | 23.08.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP3989999 | 18.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60014209T | 03.02.2005 | T2 | DE60014209D1 | 04.11.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP3989999 | 18.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6273770 | 14.08.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP3989999 | 18.02.1999 |