EP1030255 - Database system with barcode reader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knapp Logistik Automation GmbH Günter-Knapp-Strasse 5-7 8075 Hart bei Graz / AT | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wünscher, Eduard, Dipl.-Ing. Günter-Knapp-Strasse 5-7 8075 Hart bei Graz / AT | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Hanke, Hilmar Patentanwalt Postfach 80 09 08 81609 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Hanke, Hilmar Patentanwalt Hanke, Hilmar, Dipl.-Ing. Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., Leopoldstrasse 77 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103545.0 | 18.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | EP19990103282 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: EP 99103282 | [2000/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030255 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
G06F16/258 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | Datenbanksystem mit Barcodeleser | [2000/34] | English: | Database system with barcode reader | [2000/34] | French: | Système de base de données avec lecteur de code à barres | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 04.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/18] | 02.12.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.12.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09218914 ; | [A]EP0483035 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 12, line 35 - column 13, line 4; figure 10 *; | [A]US5285384 (GINERIS ANGELO J [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 18 - line 38 * * column 2, line 21 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9803923 (ERNESTINE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A] - DWYER P A ET AL, "Some Experiences with a Distributed Database Testbed System", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE,US,IEEE. NEW YORK, vol. 75, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9219, page 633-648-648, XP002110503 [A] 1,8 * page 633, column L, line 1 - page 635, column R, line 8; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09218914 A 19970819 (CANON INC) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | Examination | US5506984 |