EP1039504 - Metal halide discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Genz, Andreas, Dr. Ringbahn 8 10711 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Gölling, Hans-Werner Goethestrasse 48 10625 Berlin / DE | [2000/39] | Application number, filing date | 00103679.7 | 22.02.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | DE1999205662U | 26.03.1999 Original published format: DE 29905662 U | [2000/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1039504 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/12 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
H01J61/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/39] | Title | German: | Metallhalogenid-Entladungslampe | [2000/39] | English: | Metal halide discharge lamp | [2000/39] | French: | Lampe à décharge aux halogénures métalliques | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/44] | 14.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9848446 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-7 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - page 5, line 6 * * page 6, line 4 - line 16 *; | [DA]US5323085 (GENZ ANDREAS [DE]) [DA] 1,6,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 24 *; | [A]US5363007 (FROMM DIETRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - line 37 * * column 1, line 56 - line 62 * * column 2, line 8 - line 17 * * column 2, line 35 - line 40 * * column 2, line 55 - line 58 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 17 * * column 3, line 36 - line 44 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 1 * * column 4, line 14 * * column 6, line 9 - line 10 * * column 7, line 4 - line 9 * * column 8, line 57 - line 64 * * column 9, line 2 - line 4 * * column 9, line 30 - line 33 * * column 9, line 39 - line 56 * * column 9, line L * * column 10, line 20 - line 22 * * column 10, line 65 - column 11, line 4 * |