EP1031961 - Gradation control of a display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2015 [2015/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Shunpei Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd., 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 02 /
Koyama, Jun Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd., 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103793.6 | 23.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | JP19990045776 | 24.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4577699 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1031961 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1031961 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G09G3/30 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
G09G3/2025 (EP,US);
G09G3/2081 (EP,US);
G09G3/3688 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0235 (EP,US);
G09G2310/027 (EP,US);
G09G3/3648 (EP,US);
G09G3/3651 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/35] | G09G3/36, G09G3/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/29] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gradationssteuerung für eine Anzeige | [2000/35] | English: | Gradation control of a display device | [2000/35] | French: | Commande de gradation pour un dispositif d'affichage | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 02.05.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 18.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/06] | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.06.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0655726 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-80 * abstract *; page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 4; figures 21,22 * * page 6, line 40 - page 7, line 21 * * page 9, line 35 - page 10, line 2; figure 1 * * page 10, line 38 - page 14, line 9; figures 5-10 * * page 14, line 31 - page 15, line 49; figures 11-14 * * page 18, line 3 - line 7 *; | [X]EP0433054 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,11,21,31,41,51,61,71 * abstract *; column 1, line 4 - line 7 * * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 4 * * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 47; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0875881 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 5,15,25,35,45,55,65,75 * abstract *; column 1, line 3 - line 9 * * column 2, line 5 - line 9 * * column 4, line 34 - line 55 * * column 11, line 40 - column 12, line 34; figure 3 * * column 13, line 44 - column 14, line 16 *; | [X]US5363118 (OKUMURA FUJIO [JP]) [X] 1,11,21,31,41,51,61,71 * abstract *; column 1, line 11 - line 23 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 21 * * column 4, line 49 - column 6, line 47; figures 4-6 *; | [A]EP0853254 (KOPIN CORP [US]) [A] 6-10,16,20,26-30,36-40,46-50,56-60,66-70,76-80 * abstract *; page 2, line 5 - line 32 * * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 14 * * page 5, line 41 - line 50 * * page 6, line 9 - line 58 * * page 9, line 26 - line 44; figure 1 * * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 34; figures 16-19 * * page 19, line 29 - line 34; figure 20 * * page 21, line 7 - line 14; figure 23 * * page 24, line 47 - page 25, line 40; figure 33 * * page 27, line 56 - page 28, line 2; figure 38 * * page 29, line 9 - line 14; figure 42 * | by applicant | EP0655726 | EP0433054 | US5363118 | EP0875881 | EP0853254 |