EP1033118 - Nasal dilator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delmore, Michael D. 3M Innovative Properties Company, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Pendergrass, Daniel B., Jr. 3M Innovative Properties Company, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Neeser, Roger D. 3M Innovative Properties Company, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
Mallo, Richard A. 3M Innovative Properties Company, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103868.6 | 24.02.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | US19990260445 | 02.03.1999 Original published format: US 260445 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033118 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033118 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/08 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
A61F5/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/21] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nasaler Dilatator | [2000/36] | English: | Nasal dilator | [2000/36] | French: | Dilatateur nasal | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 07.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.04.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9857613 (BIOFARM SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-11,13-19,22,23 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 36; example 2; claim - * [Y] 20,21; | [Y]EP0195254 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [Y] 20,21 * abstract *; | [AD]US5706800 (CRONK PETER J [US], et al); | [A]US5455043 (FISCHEL-GHODSIAN FARIBA [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9827897 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | by applicant | US5706800 | US5549103 | US4414977 | US1292083 | US1950839 | US5476091 | US5533499 | US5533503 |