|
12.11.2003 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.07.2002 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2002 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.06.2002 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.06.2002 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2002 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
01.10.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
01.10.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Letter concerning publication issues |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Letter concerning publication issues |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2000 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Letter concerning publication issues |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.2000 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2000 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
8 |