EP1013760 - Stable bactericidal/permeabilityincreasing protein products and pharmaceutical compositions containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XOMA Technology Ltd. c/o XOMA (US) LLC, 2910 Seventh Street Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | [2000/36] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Xoma Technology Lt. Clarendon House, 2 Church Street Hamilton HM11 / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Theofan, Georgia 2817 Jacaranda Avenue Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | 02 /
Baltaian, Manik 461 Myrtle Glendale, California 91203 / US | 03 /
Horwitz, Arnold 7529 Midfield Los Angeles, California 90045 / US | 04 /
Grinna, Lynn P.O. Box 2260 Middleburg, VA 22117 / US | 05 /
Burke, David 5957 Chabolyn Terrace Oakland, California 94618 / US | [2000/41] |
Former [2000/26] | 01 /
Theofan, georgia 3014 Sonoma Street Torrence, California 90503 / US | ||
02 /
Baltaian, Manik 461 Myrtle Glendale, California 91203 / US | |||
03 /
Horwitz, Arnold 7529 Midfield Los Angeles, California 90045 / US | |||
04 /
Grinna, Lynn P.O. Box 2260 Middleburg, VA 22117 / US | |||
05 /
Burke, David 5957 Chabolyn Terrace Oakland, California 94618 / US | Representative(s) | Richardson, Kate Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Richardson, Kate Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103901.5 | 02.02.1994 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | US19930013801 | 02.02.1993 Original published format: US 13801 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1013760 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1013760 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013760 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, A61K38/17 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C07K19/00 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61K38/16 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
C07K14/47 (KR);
C07K14/4742 (EP,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
C12P21/02 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12N2830/00 (EP,US);
C12N2830/15 (EP,US);
C12N2830/30 (EP,US);
C12N2830/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | Stabile Produkte des bakterientötenden/durchlässigkeiterhöhenden Proteins (PBI) und diese enthaltende Arzneimittelzusammensetzungen | [2000/26] | English: | Stable bactericidal/permeabilityincreasing protein products and pharmaceutical compositions containing the same | [2000/26] | French: | Produits stables de la protéine bactéricide augmentant la perméabilité et compositions thérapeutiques les contenant | [2000/26] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 24.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 13.11.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94908704.3 / EP0689592 | Divisional application(s) | EP03000252.1 / EP1310558 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.01.2003 | BE | 08.01.2003 | CH | 08.01.2003 | GR | 08.01.2003 | LI | 08.01.2003 | NL | 08.01.2003 | DK | 08.04.2003 | PT | 08.04.2003 | SE | 08.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2004/10] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 08.01.2003 | |
CH | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 08.01.2003 | |
CH | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 08.01.2003 | |
CH | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
LI | 08.01.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 08.01.2003 | |
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 08.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - WEISS, J. ET AL., "Human bactericidal/permeability-increasing protein and a recombinant NH2-terminal fragment cause killing of serum-resistant Gram-negative bacteria in whole blood and inhibit tumor necrosis factor release induced by the bacteria.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATIONS, (199209), vol. 90, pages 1122 - 30, XP000914563 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI115930 |