EP1031838 - Apparatus for measuring angular velocity variation rate of rotary axle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Meidensha 1-17, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Meidensha 1-17, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyamoto, Teruo, c/o Coco Research inc. Shinnakano Coco Res.Bldg., 40-4,Chuo 3-chome Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-0011 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Yorikatsu, Kabushiki Kaisha Meidensha 1-17, Osaki 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104005.4 | 25.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | JP19990050933 | 26.02.1999 Original published format: JP 5093399 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1031838 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1031838 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/16, G01P3/48 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
G01P3/48 (EP,US);
G01P15/165 (EP,US);
G01P21/00 (EP,US);
G01P3/489 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/35] | G01P15/16, G01P3/489, G01P3/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/50] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gerät zur Messung der Winkelgeschwindigkeitsänderungsrate einer Drehachse | [2000/35] | English: | Apparatus for measuring angular velocity variation rate of rotary axle | [2000/35] | French: | Appareil pour la mesure de la variation de la vitesse angulaire d'une axe rotatif | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 17.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 24.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.10.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0571886 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD [JP]) [YD] 1-14 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 13 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]JPH04331370 ; | [AD]US4989458 (SUZUKI YORIKATSU [JP]) [AD] 4-6 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930405), vol. 017, no. 175, Database accession no. (P - 1516), & JP04331370 A 19921119 (HORIBA LTD) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * |