05.10.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
06.10.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
14.10.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] |
23.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.05.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.12.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
06.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.04.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
10.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.04.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
31.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.01.2002 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
26.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.11.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
08.10.2001 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
20.07.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] |
20.07.2001 |
First examination report |
|
17.07.2001 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
13.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.05.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] |
27.10.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
21.10.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] |
11.08.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] |