Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50011720D1 | 05.01.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19908653 | 27.02.1999 | DE50011720 | 26.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1038514 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2005 | B1 | EP1038514 | 13.12.2000 | A3 | EP1038514 | 27.09.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19908653 | 27.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19908653 | 31.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19908653 | 27.02.1999 |