EP1035267 - Girder element for a fire-resistant roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. Eberspächer GmbH & Co. KG Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2002/23] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states J. Eberspächer GmbH & Co. Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrof, Eugen Böhmerwaldstrasse 10 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2000/37] | Application number, filing date | 00104206.8 | 01.03.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | DE1999110423 | 10.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19910423 | [2000/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1035267 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1035267 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/08, E06B5/16, E04B1/94 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
E04D3/08 (EP);
E04D2003/0818 (EP);
E04D2003/0831 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [2002/36] |
Former [2000/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Träger als Element eines feuerwiderstandsfähigen Daches | [2000/37] | English: | Girder element for a fire-resistant roof | [2000/37] | French: | Elément de support pour un toit résistant au feu | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0709540 (EBERSPAECHER J [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 12 - line 30 * * column 6, line 23 - line 38 * * figure 3 * | by applicant | EP0384418 | DE3919914 |