EP1130485 - System and method for monitoring of a roll with a core and a sheath [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clouth-Gummiwalzen GmbH & Co. KG Xantener Strasse / Tor 50733 Köln / DE | [2002/12] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Hilzinger-Gummiwalzen GmbH & Co. KG Siemensstrasse 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beier, Wolfgang Moitzfeld 72 b 51429 Bergisch-Gladbach / DE | [2001/36] | Application number, filing date | 00104207.6 | 01.03.2000 | [2001/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1130485 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/12, G05B19/418 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
D21F3/08 (EP);
D21G1/00 (EP);
D21G1/008 (EP);
F16C13/00 (EP);
G05B19/128 (EP);
B21B27/02 (EP);
B21B27/03 (EP);
B21B38/00 (EP);
B21B38/08 (EP);
G05B2219/49302 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/21] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sytem und Verfahren zur Überwachung einer Walze mit einem Walzenkern und einem Walzenmantel | [2001/36] | English: | System and method for monitoring of a roll with a core and a sheath | [2001/36] | French: | Système et procédé pour la surveillance d' un rouleau avec coeur et gaine | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 02.11.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 06.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/09] | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.06.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.06.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19646707 (KSL KEILMANN SONDERMASCHINENBA [DE]) [Y] 1,2,9,10,17 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 58 *; | [Y]EP0563713 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [Y] 1,2,9,10,17 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5359160 (WIRTZ ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1,9,17 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 9 *; | [A]EP0490167 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]) [A] * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3540126 (BAECKMANN REINHARD) [A] * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0616202 (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]) [A] * figure 5 *; | [A]EP0459668 (DU PONT [US]) [A] * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4809426 (TAKEUCHI KUNIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] * figure 4 *; | [A]US4630044 (POLZER RUDOLF [DE]) [A] * figures 1,2 * |