EP1035354 - Chain-operated traction unit for drawing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | Change - representative | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coccolo Enzo Via Lasciac, 38/2 34170 Gorizia / IT | [2000/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | ||
Former [2000/37] | Cragnolini, Sergio Viale Venezia 277 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 00104249.8 | 02.03.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | IT1999UD00054 | 10.03.1999 Original published format: IT UD990054 | [2000/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1035354 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1035354 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/18, F16G11/12 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
B65H51/14 (EP);
B29C48/355 (EP);
B29C70/527 (EP);
B66D3/003 (EP);
F16G13/18 (EP);
B29C48/03 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/37] | F16G13/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/20] |
Former [2002/14] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kettengetriebene Zugeinrichtung zum Ziehen | [2000/37] | English: | Chain-operated traction unit for drawing | [2000/37] | French: | Dispositif de traction par chaines pour étirage | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/02] | 31.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.05.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE452225 (SCHRÖDER) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0442037 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 29; figures 1,2 * |