EP1033831 - Base station apparatus and frame synchronization acquisition method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyoshi, Kenichi 1-240-1-501, Mutsukawa, Minami-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 232-0066 / JP | 02 /
Hiramatsu, Katsuhiko 4-21-4-102 Kurihama Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0831 / JP | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104394.2 | 02.03.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | JP19990056811 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5681199 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1033831 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1033831 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04J3/06 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
H04B7/269 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/36] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE [2004/14] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Basisstations-Vorrichtung und -Verfahren zur Rahmensynchronisation | [2005/19] | English: | Base station apparatus and frame synchronization acquisition method | [2000/36] | French: | Appareil pour station de base et méthode d'acquisition de synchronisation de trame | [2000/36] |
Former [2000/36] | Gerät für Basisstation und Verfahren zum Ereignen einer Rahmensynchronisation | Examination procedure | 16.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 07.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/17] | 21.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH05308333 ; | [A]JPS58151142 ; | [X] - HODGES M R L, THE GSM RADIO INTERFACE, BRITISH TELECOM TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, LONDON, GB, VOL. 8, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 31-43, XP000575496 [X] 4 * figure 1 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940223), vol. 018, no. 113, Database accession no. (E - 1514), & JP05308333 A 19931119 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [DA] 1,3,5,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831129), vol. 007, no. 267, Database accession no. (E - 213), & JP58151142 A 19830908 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [A] 2,6 * abstract * | [A] - LAGRANGE X ET AL, Autonomous inter base station synchronisation via a common broadcast control channel, VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1994 IEEE 44TH STOCKHOLM, SWEDEN 8-10 JUNE 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, PAGE(S) 1050-1054, ISBN 0-7803-1927-3, XP010123236 [A] * page 1050, column L, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1994.345252 | [A] - KAZAMA H ET AL, Semi-autonomous synchronization for TDMA-TDD communication systems, GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1993, INCLUDING A COMMUNICATIONS THEORY MINI-CONFERENCE. TECHNICAL PROGRAM CONFERENCE RECORD, IEEE IN HOUSTON. GLOBECOM '93., IEEE HOUSTON, TX, USA 29 NOV.-2 DEC. 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, PAGE(S) 527-531, ISBN 0-7803-0917-0, XP010109718 [A] * page 527, column L, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1993.318137 | [A] - LINDSEY W C ET AL, "NETWORK SYNCHRONIZATION TECHNIQUES: AN OVERVIEW", NTZ ARCHIV, VDE VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (198207), vol. 4, no. 7, ISSN 0170-172X, pages 183 - 188, XP000806449 [A] * figure 4; table 1 * |