07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
22.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
21.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
21.12.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
10.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
03.08.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
25.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
18.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
20.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
06.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
25.08.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] |
17.08.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.08.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.09.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.06.2005 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
11.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.09.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.07.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.07.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
06.07.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
13.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.03.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] |
12.03.2004 |
First examination report |
|
10.03.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.02.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] |
20.06.2003 |
Publication of search report |
published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] |
20.06.2003 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] |
09.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.08.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] |