EP1085786 - Accelerator system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiramoto, Kazuo Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Property, New Marunouchi Bldg. 1-5-1 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
Akiyama, Hiroshi Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Property, New Marunouchi Bldg. 1-5-1 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/12] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104549.1 | 13.03.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | JP19990259889 | 14.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25988999 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1085786 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1085786 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05H7/06, G21K5/04 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
H05H7/06 (EP,US);
G21K5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/44] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Beschleunigersanlage | [2001/12] | English: | Accelerator system | [2001/12] | French: | Système accélérateur | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP1194300 ; | [A]JPH10106800 ; | [A]JP3227000 ; | [XY]US3343020 (GORDON HAYDEN S) [X] 1 * column 4, line 45 - line 70 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-4; | [DY]US5538494 (MATSUDA KOJI [JP]) [DY] 2,4 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 10 * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 53 * * figure 19 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891106), vol. 0134, no. 86, Database accession no. (E - 840), & JP1194300 A 19890804 (TOKIN CORP) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10106800 A 19980424 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911204), vol. 0154, no. 76, Database accession no. (E - 1140), & JP3205797 A 19910909 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920108), vol. 0160, no. 04, Database accession no. (E - 1151), & JP3227000 A 19911007 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH07303710 |