EP1039279 - Method for assessing the optical power of an emitting diode in a monitoring unit and suitable circuitry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Härle, Thomas Weissenburger Strasse 1 86157 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Reisacher, Günter Köhlstrasse 29 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/05] |
Former [2000/39] | Kolb, Georg, et al DaimlerChrysler AG, Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104738.0 | 04.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | DE1999112971 | 23.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19912971 | [2000/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039279 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039279 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01J1/42, G01J1/02, G01J1/32 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
G01J1/42 (EP,US);
G01J1/02 (EP,US);
G01J1/0228 (EP,US);
G01J2001/4252 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/39] | G01J1/42, G01J1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/50] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erfassung der Lichtleistung einer Sendediode einer optischen Überwachungseinheit sowie geeignete Schaltungsanordnung | [2000/39] | English: | Method for assessing the optical power of an emitting diode in a monitoring unit and suitable circuitry | [2000/39] | French: | Méthode de détection de la puissance optique émise par une diode dans une unité de surveillance et circuit approprié | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/37] | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0112498 (ASEA AB [SE]) [DX] 1,2 * page 4, line 22 - page 7, line 21 *; | [Y]US4605302 (LOEFGREN FOLKE [SE], et al) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 1 - line 10 *; | [A]DE19539422 (DOCTER OPTIK WETZLAR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* column 1, line 60 - column 4, line 2 *; | [DXAY]DE19704793 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [DX] 1,2,7 * column 1, line 49 - column 4, line 57 * * figure 1B * [A] 3-5 [Y] 6 |