EP1134891 - Circuit arrangement for working point adjustment of a high frequency transistor and amplifier circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaffer, Josef-Paul Herzog-Platz 2 85604 Zorneding / DE | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Hermann, Uwe, et al Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Hermann, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing., et al Epping, Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104820.6 | 06.03.2000 | [2001/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1134891 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/30 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
H03F1/302 (EP,KR,US);
H03F3/19 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/23] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Arbeitspunkteinstellung eines Hochfrequenztransistors und Verstärkerschaltung | [2001/38] | English: | Circuit arrangement for working point adjustment of a high frequency transistor and amplifier circuit | [2001/38] | French: | Circuit pour l'ajustement du point de fonctionnement d'un transistor haute fréquence et circuit amplificateur | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/04] | 26.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.04.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2312575 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2-4,6* page 13, line 13 - page 17, line 16; figure 2 *; | [Y]US5854578 (MINASI DAVID H [US], et al) [Y] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [Y] - DIEULEVEULT DE F, "AMPLIFICATEUR DE PUISSANCE 500MW, UHF", ELECTRONIQUE RADIO PLANS,FR,SPE, PARIS, (19940501), no. 558, ISSN 1144-5742, pages 57 - 60, XP000448072 [Y] 1,10 * page 58; figure 2 * |