EP1034821 - Game apparatus, control method for game apparatus, and recording medium with game program recorded therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6021 / JP | [2000/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horikawa, Kentaro, 202, Hokushin Haitsu 7-3-11, Kitagoh Nijyo, Shiroishi-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 003-0832 / JP | 02 /
Kato, Hidenori, 202, Haitsu MU 5, Hondori 4-chome Kita, Shiroishi-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 003-0027 / JP | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/37] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104832.1 | 07.03.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | JP19990062812 | 10.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6281299 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1034821 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/10 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
A63F13/822 (EP);
A63F13/63 (US);
A63F13/55 (EP);
A63F13/825 (EP,US);
A63F13/69 (US);
A63F2300/8058 (EP);
A63F2300/807 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spielvorrichtung, Kontrollverfahren für Spielvorrichtung und entsprechendes Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2000/37] | English: | Game apparatus, control method for game apparatus, and recording medium with game program recorded therein | [2000/37] | French: | Appareil de jeu, méthode de contrôle pour appareil de jeu et support d'enregistrement correspondant | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/23] | 10.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |