23.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
28.09.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
20.10.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
29.08.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.08.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.04.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.08.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.05.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.08.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.06.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2004 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
11.02.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.02.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
19.11.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
19.11.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
11.11.2003 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.10.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.08.2003 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.07.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] |
16.05.2003 |
First examination report |
|
15.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.03.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |
01.11.2002 |
Publication of search report |
published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
17.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.01.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |