Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1079163 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2006 | B1 | EP1079163 | 18.12.2002 | A3 | EP1079163 | 28.02.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2282039 | 30.08.1999 | US38334499 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2282039 | 21.08.2007 | C | CA2282039 | 28.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2282039 | 30.08.1999 | US38334499 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1172104C | 20.10.2004 | C | CN1291692 | 18.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2282039 | 30.08.1999 | US38334499 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6250690 | 26.06.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | CA2282039 | 30.08.1999 | US38334499 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60031923T | 26.07.2007 | T2 | DE60031923D1 | 04.01.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US38334499 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1034560 | 26.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38334499 | 26.08.1999 |