EP1038795 - Package for a zeolite and its use to fill an adsorption tower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirano, Shigeru Room 203, 4-10-3 Madokoro Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Morikuni, Katsuyuki 537-10 Tajima Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 00105133.3 | 10.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | JP19990077259 | 23.03.1999 Original published format: JP 7725999 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1038795 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1038795 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/26 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
B65D81/266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [2001/24] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verpackung für einen Zeolith sowie ihre Verwendung zur Befüllung einer Adsorbtionseinheit | [2000/39] | English: | Package for a zeolite and its use to fill an adsorption tower | [2000/39] | French: | Emballage pour une zéolithe et son utilisation pour remplir une unité d'adsorption | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9745335 (MALLINCKRODT CHEMICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 17 - page 7, line 26; figure - *; | [A]EP0719715 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2,5 *; | [A]GB2306169 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 10; claims 1,13,17 *; | [DA]JPH1159782 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO) [DA] 8 * abstract * |