EP1038995 - Process and apparatus for producing single crystals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freiberger Compound Materials GmbH Am Junger Löwe Schacht 5 09599 Freiberg / DE | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Freiberger Compound Materials GmbH Am Junger Löwe Schacht 5 09599 Freiberg / DE | ||
For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | |||
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states Freiberger Compound Materials GmbH Am Junger Löwe Schacht 5 09599 Freiberg / DE | ||
For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | |||
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Freiberger Compound Materials GmbH Am Junger Löwe Schacht 5 09599 Freiberg / DE | ||
For all designated states FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH 52425 Jülich / DE | |||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Freiberger Compound Materials GmbH Am Junger Löwe Schacht 5 09599 Freiberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sonnenberg, Klaus Taubenforst 3 52382 Niederzier / DE | 02 /
Küssel, Eckhard Fritz Pleystrasse 28 52353 Düren / DE | 03 /
Bünger, Thomas Klopstockstrasse 3 09131 Chemnitz / DE | 04 /
Flade, Thilo Dörnerzaunstrasse 11 09599 Freiberg / DE | 05 /
Weinert, Berndt Turnerstrasse 9 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00105206.7 | 13.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | DE1999112486 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19912486 | [2000/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1038995 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1038995 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C30B11/00, C30B11/14, C30B29/42, C30B29/40 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
C30B29/42 (EP,US);
C30B11/14 (EP,US);
C30B29/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/24] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Einkristallen | [2000/39] | English: | Process and apparatus for producing single crystals | [2000/39] | French: | Procédé et appareillage pour la production des monocristaux | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.04.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 26.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06298588 ; | [AD]EP0671490 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [AD] 1,8,13 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0744476 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [AD] 1,8,13 * figure 10; claim 8 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06298588 A 19941025 (DOWA MINING CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - AMON J ET AL, "Analysis of types of residual dislocations in the VGF growth of GaAs with extremely low dislocation density (EPD@?1000cm) - A Tutorial Approach, X-Ray Topographic Techniques for Electronic Materials Characterization", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH,NL,NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, (199903), vol. 198-199, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 367 - 373, XP004170881 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(98)01219-6 |