EP1037140 - Method and apparatus providing security during modification of memory contents in control devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohler, Rolf Stiegelstrasse 30 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 02 /
Braun, Guenter Egerstrasse 23 74321 Bietigheim / DE | 03 /
Kottmann, Matthias Aichelbergweg 3 73240 Wendlingen / DE | [2012/24] |
Former [2000/38] | 01 /
Kohler, Rolf Stiegelstrasse 30 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | ||
02 /
Braun, Guenter Egerstrasse 23 74321 Bietigheim / DE | |||
03 /
Kottman, Matthias Aichelbergweg 3 73240 Wendlingen / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/32] | Application number, filing date | 00105452.7 | 15.03.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | DE1999111794 | 17.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19911794 | [2000/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1037140 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1037140 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1037140 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14, G11C16/10 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
G06F11/1433 (EP,US);
G06F8/65 (EP,US);
G11C16/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | G06F9/24, G11C16/10 | ||
Former IPC [2000/38] | G06F9/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/13] |
Former [2000/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Absicherung bei Veränderung des Speicherinhalts von Steuergeräten | [2000/38] | English: | Method and apparatus providing security during modification of memory contents in control devices | [2000/38] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour sécurisation pendant la modification de données emmagasinées dans une mémoire de dispositif de commande | [2000/38] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE19619354 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DX] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0664387 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH09161493 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09161493 A 19970620 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19619354 | DE19623145 |