EP1040898 - Knife shaft holding means for the knife of a machine for slicing salmon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berndt, Günter Mühlenstrasse 13 21516 Müssen / DE | [2000/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00105751.2 | 17.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | DE19992005889U | 31.03.1999 Original published format: DE 29905889 U | [2000/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1040898 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1040898 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/26, B26D1/147 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
B26D1/147 (EP);
B26D1/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/40] | B26D7/26 | Designated contracting states | [2004/08] |
Former [2000/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Messerwellen-Aufnahmeeinheit für Messer einer Lachsschneidemaschine | [2000/40] | English: | Knife shaft holding means for the knife of a machine for slicing salmon | [2000/40] | French: | Dispositif pour supporter l'axe du couteau d'une machine pour trancher du saumon | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/37] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.01.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3985057 (BETTCHER LOUIS A) [Y] 1 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US1774913 (CAMPBELL WILLIAM J) [Y] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]GB966229 (GLOBE SLICING MACHINE CO INC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2823718 (BROWN JAMES D) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE4241957 (SCHOBER WERKZEUG & MASCHBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |