EP1016805 - Magnetorheological fluid devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LORD CORPORATION 200 West Grandview Blvd. Erie PA 16514-0038 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states LORD CORPORATION 200 West Grandview Blvd. Erie, PA 16514-0038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlson, J. David 429 Oakridge Road Cary, NC 27511 / US | 02 /
Chrzan, Michael, J. 3000-C Walnut Creek Parkway, Raleigh, NC 27606 / US | 03 /
James, Frank O. 4170 North Creek Road Girard, PA 16417 / US | [2003/14] |
Former [2000/27] | 01 /
Carlson, J. David 429 Oakridge Road Cary, NC 27511 / US | ||
02 /
Chrzan, Michael, J. 3000-C Walnut Creek Parkway, Raleigh, NC 27606 / US | |||
03 /
James, Grank O. 4170 North Creek Road Girard, PA 16417 / US | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al c/o Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00105842.9 | 18.06.1993 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | US19920900567 | 18.06.1992 Original published format: US 900567 | US19920900571 | 18.06.1992 Original published format: US 900571 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1016805 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1016805 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016805 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/53, F16F13/30 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
F16F13/305 (EP);
F16F9/535 (EP);
H01F1/447 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | F16F9/53 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/27] | Title | German: | Magnetorheologische Flüssigkeitsvorrichtungen | [2000/27] | English: | Magnetorheological fluid devices | [2000/27] | French: | Dispositifs à fluide magnétorhéologique | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 03.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93916607.0 / EP0644987 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS58221034 ; | [Y]JPS59184007 ; | [A]US3059915 (KEMELHOR ROBERT E) [A] 1,3 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPS62251539 ; | [A]FR1094516 (ALLINQUANT F S) | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840409), vol. 008, no. 076, Database accession no. (M - 288), & JP58221034 A 19831222 (SHIYOUWA SEISAKUSHO:KK) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [Y] 2 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850222), vol. 009, no. 042, Database accession no. (M - 359), & JP59184007 A 19841019 (NIHON HATSUJIYOU KK) [Y] 2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880419), vol. 012, no. 126, Database accession no. (M - 687), & JP62251539 A 19871102 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |