EP1004496 - Steering wheel, mounting structure thereof and boss structure thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Nagahata, Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | [2006/39] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Nagahata, Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosoi, Akio 302, Fujishima 2-chome Komaki-shi / JP | 02 /
Nagata, Atsushi 81-Ishibashi-4-chome Inazawa-shi / JP | 03 /
Sakane, Katsunobu 874-44, Ogashima, Azaicho Kohibino Ichinomiya-shi / JP | 04 /
Takamori, Tetsuya 66, Shimamiyacho Yoshihara Konan-shi / JP | 05 /
Yamamoto, Hitoshi 88-1-303, Atagocho-7-chome Tsushima-shi / JP | 06 /
Mizuno, Takanori 14-9, Toeicho-1-chome Owariasahi-shi / JP | [2006/20] |
Former [2000/36] | 01 /
Hosoi, Akio 302, Fujishima 2-chome Komaki-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Nagata, Atsushi 81-Ishibashi-4-chome Inazawa-shi / JP | |||
03 /
Sakane, Katsunobu 874-44, Ogashima, Azaicho Kohibino Ichinomiya-shi / JP | |||
04 /
Takamori, Tetsuva 66, Shimamiyacho Yoshihara Konan-shi / JP | |||
05 /
Yamamoto, Hitoshi 88-1-303, Atagocho-7-chome Tsushima-shi / JP | |||
06 /
Mizuno, Takanori 14-9, Toeicho-1-chome Owariasahi-shi / JP | |||
Former [2000/22] | 01 /
Hosoi, Akio 302, Fujishima 2-chome Komaki-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Nagata, Atsushi 31-Ishibashi-4-chome Inazawa-shi / JP | |||
03 /
Sakane, Katsunobu 874-44, Ogashima, Azaicho Kohibino Ichinomiya-shi / JP | |||
04 /
Takamori, Tetsuva 66, Shimamiyacho Yoshihara Konan-shi / JP | |||
05 /
Yamamoto, Hitoshi 88-1-303, Atagocho-7-chome Tsushima-shi / JP | |||
06 /
Mizuno, Takanori 14-9, Toeicho-1-chome Owariasahi-shi / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/22] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00105873.4 | 07.01.1997 | [2000/22] | Priority number, date | JP19960038241 | 26.02.1996 Original published format: JP 3824196 | JP19960055804 | 13.03.1996 Original published format: JP 5580496 | JP19960055805 | 13.03.1996 Original published format: JP 5580596 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1004496 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1004496 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1004496 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/04 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
B60R21/203 (EP,US);
B62D1/04 (EP,US);
B62D1/10 (EP,US);
F16B2200/403 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7033 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20834 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/24] | B62D1/04, B62D1/10 | ||
Former IPC [2000/22] | B62D1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/22] | Title | German: | Lenkrad, Montageanordnung und Nabenstruktur dafür | [2000/24] | English: | Steering wheel, mounting structure thereof and boss structure thereof | [2000/22] | French: | Volant de direction, structure de montage et structure de moyeu pour cela | [2000/22] |
Former [2000/22] | Lenkrad ,Montageanordnung und Wabenstruktur dafür | Examination procedure | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97100137.5 / EP0791520 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06285607 ; | [A]GB2058694 (FAUL T L) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 36 - line 83 * * page 2, line 96 - page 3, line 23 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0685379 (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,7 * column 3, line 1 - line 43; figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 095, no. 001, & JP06285607 A 19941011 (TOYODA GOSEI CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figure - * | by applicant | JPS6060065U | JPH02133955U |