EP1016689 - Olefin thermoplastic elastomer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/10] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawasaki, Masaaki Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | 02 /
Okada, Keiji Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | 03 /
Tojo, Tetsuo Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Kyoko Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | 05 /
Itoh, Yuichi Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | 06 /
Uchiyama, Akira Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | 07 /
Tsutsui, Toshiyuki Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | 08 /
Sagane, Toshihiro Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00105908.8 | 28.06.1996 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | JP19950164362 | 29.06.1995 Original published format: JP 16436295 | JP19950294546 | 13.11.1995 Original published format: JP 29454695 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1016689 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1016689 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016689 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/16, C08L23/02 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
C08L23/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61J1/03 (EP,US);
B65D23/003 (EP,US);
B65D51/28 (EP,US);
C08K5/14 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/142 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/22 (EP,US);
C08L91/00 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/02, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815, C08L23/142, C08L23/22, C08L91/00, C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
C08L23/10, C08K5/14, C08L23/16, C08L2312/00 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L23/0815 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2000/38] | C08L23/16, C08L23/02, // (C08L23/02, 23:16),(C08L23/16, 23:02) | ||
Former IPC [2000/27] | C08L23/02, C08L23/16, // (C08L23/02, 23:16),(C08L23/16, 23:02) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/27] | Title | German: | Olefinthermoplastische Elastomerzusammensetzungen | [2000/27] | English: | Olefin thermoplastic elastomer compositions | [2000/27] | French: | Compositions d'oléfine elastomère thermoplastique | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 05.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 06.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96304811.1 / EP0751182 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH061887 ; | [A]EP0552946 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [E]EP0748842 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [E] 1-15 * page 7, line 52 - line 57; claim - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 06, Database accession no. 94-045548, XP002016089 & JPH061887 A 19940111 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |