EP1043350 - Method of preparing rigid polyurethane foam and composition for rigid polyurethane foam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiba, Takanori 11-16, Shinkofudai 5-chome, Toyono-cho Toyono-gun, Osaka, Pref. 563-0105 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Takuya 25-18, Motomachi Suita, Osaka-Pref., 564-0031 / JP | 03 /
Ono, Jeiji 20-9-402, Aramaki 5-chome Itami, Hyogo-Pref. 664-0001 / JP | 04 /
Shimizu, Takehiro 7-30, Koushien 4-bancho Nishinomiya, Hyogo-Pref., 663-8174 / JP | [2000/41] | Application number, filing date | 00106006.0 | 27.03.2000 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | JP19990101245 | 08.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10124599 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1043350 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1043350 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/50, C08J9/04, C08G18/48 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
C08G18/6611 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0025 (EP,US);
C08G2110/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/41] | C08G18/50, C08J9/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/07] |
Former [2000/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyurethanhartschaum und Zusammensetzung für Polyurethanhartschaum | [2000/41] | English: | Method of preparing rigid polyurethane foam and composition for rigid polyurethane foam | [2000/41] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de mousse de polyuréthane rigide et composition pour mousse de polyuréthane rigide | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 24.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | 04.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0826708 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * examples 2,3; claim - *; | [X]WO9716477 (BASF CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 19, line 19 - page 19, line 35; example -; claim - *; | [X]US5648019 (WHITE III WALTER R [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]WO9735899 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * example 3; claim - * |