EP1136244 - Method for manufacturing shoes with foamed soles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chi, Cheng-Hsian No. 15, Lane 22, Tung Hsing East Street Taichung / TW | [2001/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00106254.6 | 22.03.2000 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136244 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136244 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29D31/515, A43B3/12, A43B13/04, A43B13/18 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
B29D35/122 (EP);
A43B13/04 (EP);
A43B13/188 (EP);
A43B3/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/24] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Schuhes mit Schaumsohle | [2001/39] | English: | Method for manufacturing shoes with foamed soles | [2001/39] | French: | Procédé de réalisation d'une chaussure avec une semelle moulée par moussage | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 27.03.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 18.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0839637 (CHI CHENG HSIAN [TW]) [A] 1,9,10,15 * column 2, line 44 - line 56; figure - *; | [A]DE1685336 (LEDERER JOSEF) [A] 1,9,10,15 * page 4, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US5843352 (CHI CHENG-HSIAN [TW]) [DA] 1,9,10,15 * column 2, line 13 - line 25; figure - *; | [A]US5787608 (GREENAWALT KENT S [US]) [A] 15 * abstract *; | [A]FR999645 (ZVI JAROST) [A] 15 * figure - *; | [A]FR2553636 (ADIDAS CHAUSSURES [FR]) [A] 2,9 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 4; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US5843352 |