EP1050458 - Device for filling and closing bags [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher Münsterstrasse 50 D-49525 Lengerich / DE | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tetenborg, Konrad Lindenstrasse 36 49525 Lengerich / DE | [2000/45] | Application number, filing date | 00106386.6 | 24.03.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | DE1999120455 | 04.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19920455 | DE1999133486 | 16.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19933486 | [2000/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050458 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050458 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/22 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
B65B1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Befüllen und Verschliessen von Säcken | [2000/45] | English: | Device for filling and closing bags | [2000/45] | French: | Dispositif pour remplir et fermer des sacs | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 28.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.10.2006 | FI | 25.10.2006 | FR | 25.10.2006 | GB | 25.10.2006 | IE | 25.10.2006 | DK | 25.01.2007 | SE | 25.01.2007 | GR | 26.01.2007 | AT | 24.03.2007 | LU | 24.03.2007 | PT | 26.03.2007 | CH | 31.03.2007 | LI | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/52] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
FR | 25.10.2006 | ||
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
AT | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
AT | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 08.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 08.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
SE | 25.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1511755 (ROVEMA GMBH) [A] 5* page 5, paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [D]EP0290879 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]); | [A]US4873815 (TETENBORG KONRAD [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 5, paragraph 5; figures 2,3 *; | [AD]EP0468376 (BL MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE [IT]) [AD] 1 * column 3, paragraph 4; figure 3 * | by applicant | EP0290879 | DE9301355U | EP0468376 |