EP1046508 - Cartridge for ink-jet recorder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | ||
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hara, Kazuhiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Usui, Minoru c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 03 /
Toba, Kouichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Takao c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/43] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00106529.1 | 12.03.1998 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | JP19970076582 | 12.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7658297 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046508 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046508 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046508 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
B41J2/17559 (EP,US);
B41J2/17503 (EP,US);
B41J2/17506 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/43] | Title | German: | Kassette für Tintenstrahldrucker | [2000/43] | English: | Cartridge for ink-jet recorder | [2000/43] | French: | Cartouche pour imprimante à jet d'encre | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98104500.8 / EP0864428 | Divisional application(s) | EP05018497.7 / EP1598197 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63153146 ; | [A]EP0117718 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]EP0553535 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0645244 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 8 * column 12, line 44 - column 13, line 9 *; | [Y]US5495272 (YAMAGUCHI SHUICHI [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * column 6, line 42 - line 52; figure 10 *; | [YA]EP0703083 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 8; | [Y]EP0726154 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 8, line 38 - line 56; figure 4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881104), vol. 012, no. 416, Database accession no. (M - 759), & JP63153146 A 19880625 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | EP0581531 |