EP1043653 - Multiple function processor for communication signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bao, Jay 77 Shaffer Road, Bridgewater New Jersey 08807 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/41] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00106703.2 | 29.03.2000 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | US19990288097 | 07.04.1999 Original published format: US 288097 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1043653 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/544 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
G06F7/5443 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mehrzweckprozessor für Nachrichtensignale | [2000/41] | English: | Multiple function processor for communication signals | [2000/41] | French: | Processeur multifonctionnel pour des signaux de communication | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |