EP1041373 - Method and apparatus for calibrating an optical spectrum analyzer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states ANDO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 19-7, Kamata 4-chome Ota-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiyoshi, Kenichi, c/o Ando Electric Co., Ltd. 19-7, Kamata 4-chome Ota-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00106726.3 | 29.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | JP19990090204 | 30.03.1999 Original published format: JP 9020499 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1041373 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1041373 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/28 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
G01J3/28 (EP,US);
G01J2003/2866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/01] |
Former [2000/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kalibrierung eines optischen Spektralanalysators | [2000/40] | English: | Method and apparatus for calibrating an optical spectrum analyzer | [2000/40] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour calibrer un analyseur de spectre optique | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/10] | 07.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5557404 (MATSUI SHIGERU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 36 - line 40 * * column 3, line 11 - line 31 * * column 6, line 62 - column 10, line 9 *; | [X]US4779216 (COLLINS JOHN B [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0692703 (UNICAM LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 17 *; | [A]EP0381053 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 28 * * column 7, line 5 - line 6 *; | [A]JPS5845525 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830603), vol. 007, no. 127, Database accession no. (P - 201), & JP58045525 A 19830316 (DAINI SEIKOSHA KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |