Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003024820 | 06.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26374502 | 04.10.2002 | JP9443699 | 01.04.1999 | US53612800 | 28.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100403715B | Global Dossier | 01.11.2003 | B1 | KR20000071528 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9443699 | 01.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3524425B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2004 | B2 | JP2000280256 | 10.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9443699 | 01.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1041406 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2004 | B1 | EP1041406 | 04.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9443699 | 01.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60015219T | 02.02.2006 | T2 | DE60015219D1 | 02.12.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP9443699 | 01.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6503384 | 07.01.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP9443699 | 01.04.1999 |