EP1041406 - Microstructure array, and methods of fabricating a microstructure array, a mold for forming a microstructure array, and a microlens array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teshima, Takayuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yagi, Takayuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/40] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00106860.0 | 30.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | JP19990094436 | 01.04.1999 Original published format: JP 9443699 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1041406 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1041406 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/00, B29D11/00 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
B81C1/00 (KR);
G02B3/0012 (EP,US);
G02B3/0031 (EP,US);
G02B3/0056 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/40] | G02B3/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/25] |
Former [2000/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mikrostrukturanordnung und Verfahren, Gerät und Form zur Erzeugung der Mikrostrukturanordnung | [2000/40] | English: | Microstructure array, and methods of fabricating a microstructure array, a mold for forming a microstructure array, and a microlens array | [2000/40] | French: | Arrangement de microstructure & dispositif, procédé et moule de fabrication de l'arrangement de microstructure | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 30.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 27.10.2004 | FR | 27.10.2004 | IT | 27.10.2004 | LI | 27.10.2004 | GB | 30.03.2005 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/32] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
FR | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GB | 30.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GB | 30.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
LI | 27.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH08258051 ; | [DA]JPH01261601 ; | [DA]JPH05303009 ; | [A]US5466926 (SASANO NOBUSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 26 - line 48 *; | [A]EP0450780 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 15 *; | [A]US5536455 (AOYAMA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 40 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08258051 A 19961008 (VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD) [DA] 1,11 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900112), vol. 014, no. 015, Database accession no. (P - 989), & JP01261601 A 19891018 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRON CO) [DA] 1,11 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940221), vol. 018, no. 106, Database accession no. (P - 1697), & JP05303009 A 19931116 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [DA] 1,11 * abstract * | Examination | JPS6054819 |