EP1041577 - Non-volatile semiconductor memory device and data erase controlling method for use therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamura, Toshio 5-15-3-503, Youkoudai, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Sugiura, Yoshihisa 1174-1-2-C, Koshigoe Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kanazawa, Kazuhisa 817-3, Kotsuka Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Sakui, Koji 4-13-14-201, Kyodo, Setagaya-ku Tokyo-To / JP | 05 /
Nakamura, Hiroshi 304, Creare-Toshiba-Shinyurigaoka, 2491 Ouzenji Asao-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107016.8 | 31.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | JP19990097003 | 02.04.1999 Original published format: JP 9700399 | JP19990182248 | 28.06.1999 Original published format: JP 18224899 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1041577 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1041577 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1041577 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/02 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
G11C16/3445 (EP,US);
G11C16/06 (KR);
G11C16/0483 (EP,US);
G11C16/16 (EP,US);
G11C16/344 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/26] |
Former [2000/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nichtflüchtige Halbleiter-Speichereinrichtung und Methode zur Datenlöschkontrolle | [2000/40] | English: | Non-volatile semiconductor memory device and data erase controlling method for use therein | [2000/40] | French: | Mémoire à semi-conducteurs non-volatile avec procédé de contrôle d'effaçage des données | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 23.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0405140 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1,7,12,15-17 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 12; figure 1E; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4207934 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [A] 1,7,12,15-17 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 18; figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0662692 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,7,12,15-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 33 ** column 15, line 15 - column 17, line 14; figure 1; claim 1 * |