EP1046868 - Refrigeration system having a refrigeration cycle which provides optimized consumption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zanon, Luciano Via Ugo Foscolo, 35 32010 Chies d'Alpago / IT | [2000/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/43] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00107058.0 | 04.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | IT1999TV00044 | 19.04.1999 Original published format: IT TV990044 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046868 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046868 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046868 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, F25B49/02, F25B41/00 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
F25B41/00 (EP,US);
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
F25B2400/03 (EP,US);
F25B2400/075 (EP,US);
F25B2400/161 (EP,US);
F25B2500/05 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/43] | F25B1/00, F25B49/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Extension states | LT | 22.03.2002 | LV | 22.03.2002 | RO | 22.03.2002 | SI | 22.03.2002 | Title | German: | Kälteanlage mit einem einen optimierten Verbrauch bietenden Kältekreislauf | [2005/14] | English: | Refrigeration system having a refrigeration cycle which provides optimized consumption | [2000/43] | French: | Système frigorifique comprenant un circuit frigorifique à consommation optimalisée | [2000/43] |
Former [2000/43] | Kälteanlage mit einem ein optimiertes Verbrauch bietenden Kältekreislauf | Examination procedure | 22.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.08.2005 | CY | 31.08.2005 | FI | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | NL | 31.08.2005 | DK | 30.11.2005 | GR | 30.11.2005 | SE | 30.11.2005 | PT | 22.02.2006 | IE | 04.04.2006 | LU | 04.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | CH | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 04.04.2006 | ||
LU | 04.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 04.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | CH | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | CH | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | CH | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CH | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 31.08.2005 | |
SE | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH01141796 ; | [A]JPH03294754 ; | [A]US4324106 (ROSS ROBERT R, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 44 - line 45 * * column 2, line 4 - column 4, line 30; figure - *; | [A]US4418548 (SAWYER GEORGE N [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US4658596 (KUWAHARA EIJI [JP]) [A] 1-12* the whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 17, & JP01141796 A 19890602 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * [A] 3,4,7-12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920406), vol. 016, no. 135, Database accession no. (M - 1230), & JP03294754 A 19911225 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |