Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1535623 | ![]() | 31.12.2008 | B1 | EP1535623 | 01.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | EP00107100 | 06.04.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU777406B | ![]() | 14.10.2004 | B2 | AU4204400 | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0009127 | 06.04.2000 | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004242454B | ![]() | 15.02.2007 | B2 | AU2004242454 | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0009127 | 06.04.2000 | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0009644 | 08.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0009127 | 06.04.2000 | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1108919T | 02.07.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP05002952 | 06.04.2000 | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1535623T | 27.04.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0009127 | 06.04.2000 | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU230271 | 30.11.2015 | B1 | HUP0200781 | 30.09.2002 | A3 | HUP0200781 | 28.08.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0009127 | 06.04.2000 | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO328983B | 05.07.2010 | B1 | NO20014851L | 07.12.2001 | L | NO20014851D0 | 05.10.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US0009127 | 06.04.2000 | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ514629 | 27.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0009127 | 06.04.2000 | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061174 | ![]() | 25.01.2001 | A3 | WO0061174 | 19.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4721488B | ![]() | 13.07.2011 | B2 | JP2001288110 | 16.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3712914B | ![]() | 02.11.2005 | B2 | JP2000319196 | 21.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1043025 | ![]() | 01.06.2005 | B1 | EP1043025 | 20.12.2000 | A3 | EP1043025 | 11.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR029160 | 18.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE296638T | 15.06.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE419002T | 15.01.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2303752 | 08.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1367702 | 04.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO5170412 | 27.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60020442T | 04.05.2006 | T2 | DE60020442D1 | 07.07.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60041291D1 | 12.02.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1043025T | 04.07.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2239953T | 16.10.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2319777T | 12.05.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1032533 | 27.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1075417 | 16.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA00003401 | 08.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY155221 | 30.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20010026 | 05.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1043025E | 30.09.2005 | E | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1535623E | 19.03.2009 | E | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200526243 | 16.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI310314B | 01.06.2009 | B | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200108169 | 06.01.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | US28835999 | 08.04.1999 | Type | ![]() | EP1535623 |