Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP1043026

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
CY 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 MC 
 NL 
 PT 
 SE 
Examination procedure16.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted01.06.2005
Opposition procedure02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit published on 24.05.2006 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:11.10.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:11.10.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:20.12.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:20.12.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:16.08.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010615
 
Event date:05.09.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.09.2001 
Event description:EXTENSION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:LT PAYMENT 20010615;LV PAYMENT 20010615;RO PAYMENT 20010615
 
Event date:25.06.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20030509
 
Event date:01.06.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:01.06.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:LT LV RO
 
Event date:01.06.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.06.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:29.06.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:07.07.2005 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60020444
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20050707
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:04.07.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:30.09.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE
 
Event date:16.10.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2239954 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:30.09.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Effective DATE:20050726
 
Event date:31.03.2006 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:24.05.2006 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20060302
 
Event date:12.08.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK GR 1032349 HK
Code Expl.:+STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:30.10.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
OWNER:SCHERING CORPORATION
Free Format Text:SCHERING CORPORATION#2000 GALLOPING HILL ROAD#KENILWORTH, NEW JERSEY 07033-0530 (US) -TRANSFER TO- SCHERING CORPORATION#2000 GALLOPING HILL ROAD#KENILWORTH, NEW JERSEY 07033-0530 (US)
 
Event date:20.09.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:13.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
OWNER:MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Free Format Text:SCHERING CORPORATION#2000 GALLOPING HILL ROAD#KENILWORTH, NEW JERSEY 07033-0530 (US) -TRANSFER TO- MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.#126 EAST LINCOLN AVENUE#RAHWAY, NEW JERSEY 07065 (US)
 
Event date:03.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL TD
Code Expl.: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS
Effective DATE:20120924
 
Event date:05.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES PC2A
Code Expl.:+TRANSFER OF PATENT
OWNER:MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Effective DATE:20121023
 
Event date:19.04.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
OWNER:SCHERING CORPORATION, US
Effective DATE:20130319
 
Event date:11.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60020444 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER:MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SCHERING CORP., 07033-0530 KENILWORTH, US
Effective DATE:20130516
 
Event date:11.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60020444 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:UEXKUELL & STOLBERG, DE
Effective DATE:20130516
 
Event date:15.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT HC 296639 AT T
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS
OWNER:MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., US
Effective DATE:20130117
 
Event date:11.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60020444 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER:MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., RAHWAY, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SCHERING CORP., 07033-0530 KENILWORTH, NEW JERSEY, US
Effective DATE:20130516
 
Event date:31.08.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20050402146 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:31.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20160329
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20160329
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20160331
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:11.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60020444 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:UEXKUELL & STOLBERG PARTNERSCHAFT VON PATENT- , DE
Effective DATE:20130516
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20160329
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20160329
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20160415
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20160331
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20160329
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.06.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20160404
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20160404
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20160311
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20160404
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20160414
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20160329
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20160414
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20160414
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20160407
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:10.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MM9D
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT NO LONGER VALID IN THE REPUBLIC OF LITHUANIA
Effective DATE:20170406
 
Event date:20.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
Effective DATE:20170430
 
Event date:06.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20170501
 
Event date:15.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 296639 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20170406
 
Event date:03.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 60020444 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:27.12.2017 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20170406
 
Event date:26.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20171229
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20171103
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170406
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170501
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170502
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170406
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170502
 
Event date:24.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170406
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20171103
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20171006
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170407
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170406
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170406
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170430
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170406
 
Event date:10.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20180510
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170406
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170430
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170407
 
Event date:21.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20170430
 
Event date:30.09.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20190425
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:15.04.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:15.04.2005 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:25.02.2005 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:01.10.2004 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:03.11.2000 
Event description:SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013
 
Event date:25.08.2000 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:07.04.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:07.04.2006 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261