EP1031992 - Flash EEPROM system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SanDisk Corporation 140 Caspian Court Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2004/50] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states SanDisk Corporation 4401 Great America Parkway, Suite 150 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harari, Eliyahou 104 Auzerais Vourt Los Gatos, California 95054 / US | 02 /
Norman, Robert D. 6656 Pebblewood Court San Jose, Calirofnia 95120 / US | 03 /
Mehrotra, Sanjay 27645 Natoma Road Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | Kopacz, William James 83, Avenue Foch 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00107163.8 | 30.03.1990 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | US19890337566 | 13.04.1989 Original published format: US 337566 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1031992 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1031992 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031992 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/06, G11C29/00 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
G11C29/26 (EP,US);
G06F12/0246 (EP,US);
G06F12/0802 (EP,US);
G06F12/0804 (EP,US);
G06F12/0866 (EP,US);
G06F12/0875 (EP,US);
G06F12/123 (EP,US);
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G06F3/0616 (EP,US);
G06F3/064 (EP,US);
G06F3/0652 (EP,US);
G06F3/0679 (EP,US);
G06F3/068 (EP,US);
G06F3/0688 (EP,US);
G11C11/5621 (EP,US);
G11C11/5628 (EP,US);
G11C11/5635 (EP,US);
G11C16/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/16 (EP,US);
G11C16/3436 (EP,US);
G11C16/344 (EP,US);
G11C16/3445 (EP,US);
G11C16/3454 (EP,US);
G11C16/3459 (EP,US);
G11C29/52 (EP,US);
G11C29/765 (EP,US);
G11C29/82 (EP,US);
G11C7/1039 (EP,US);
G11C8/12 (EP,US);
G06F11/1068 (EP,US);
G06F2212/2022 (EP,US);
G06F2212/312 (EP,US);
G06F2212/7201 (EP,US);
G06F2212/7203 (EP,US);
G06F2212/7205 (EP,US);
G06F2212/7207 (EP,US);
G06F2212/7208 (EP,US);
G06F3/0664 (EP,US);
G11C2211/5621 (EP,US);
G11C2211/5634 (EP,US);
G11C2211/5643 (EP,US);
G11C2216/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/35] | G11C16/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/35] | Title | German: | EEprom-System mit Blocklöschung | [2000/35] | English: | Flash EEPROM system | [2000/35] | French: | Système EEprom avec effacement en bloc | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 09.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90400885.1 / EP0392895 | EP95107965.6 / EP0675502 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60178564 ; | [A]US4214280 (HALFHILL MARTIN O [US], et al); | [A]WO8400628 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [A]GB2136992 (COZA GEORG V); | [A]US4525839 (NOZAWA MASAFUMI [JP], et al); | [X]AU557723B (BLUE CIRCLE SOUTHERN CEMENT LT); | [A]EP0243503 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4733394 (GIEBEL BURKHARD [DE]); | [A]US4746998 (ROBINSON DON M [US], et al); | [X]US4748320 (YORIMOTO YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al); | [A]US4750158 (GIEBEL BURKHARD [DE], et al); | [A]US4774700 (SATOH ISAO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0300264 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]); | [L]US4896262 (WAYAMA YUKIO [JP], et al); |