EP1057931 - Soft roll and process for making such a roll [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2001/33] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kärger, Jens Christian, Dr. Bühlackerweg 32 8405 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Vodermayer, Albert Maria, Dr. Klotener Strasse 6 8305 Dietlikon / CH | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/49] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107311.3 | 04.04.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | DE19991025421 | 02.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19925421 | [2000/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1057931 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1057931 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1057931 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21G1/02 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
F16C13/00 (EP,US);
D21G1/0233 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49549 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2002/32] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elastische Walze und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer solchen | [2000/49] | English: | Soft roll and process for making such a roll | [2000/49] | French: | Rouleau élastique et procédé de fabrication d' un tel rouleau | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 22.05.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.07.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2407292 (KUESTERS EDUARD [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0582950 (SIGRI GREAT LAKES CARBON GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,8-11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9707281 (KUESTERS EDUARD MASCHF [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,11,12 * the whole document *; | [X]DE29722778U (FUNCK RALPH DR ING [DE]) [X] 1,4,8,10,11* the whole document * |