EP1044918 - Apparatus for taking up a flexible elongate element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Katimex Cielker GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 50 54584 Jünkerath / DE | [2000/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasberg, Josef Lokenbach 8 51491 Overath / DE | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel Stenger - Watzke - Ring intellectual property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2000/42] | Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel, Dipl.-Ing. Rondorfer Strasse 5a 50968 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107428.5 | 06.04.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | DE1999119005 | 27.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19919005 | DE1999117183 | 16.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19917183 | [2000/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1044918 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1044918 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1044918 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/36, B65H75/44 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
B65H75/364 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/42] | B65H75/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme von wickel-oder speicherbaren Elementen | [2000/42] | English: | Apparatus for taking up a flexible elongate element | [2000/42] | French: | Dispositif d'emmagasinage d'un élément allongé flexible | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 20.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.07.2003 | MC | 30.04.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/02] | MC | 30.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09278282 ; | [A]DE6910759U (HAGIST HANS ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * page 8, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2333435 (CIELKER WERNER); | [A]GB2172079 (PEARPOINT LTD) [A] * page 1, line 105 - line 110 *; | [DA]DE3636943 (KATIMEX CIELKER GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4429372 (C N T CONTACTNORMTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 36 - line 48; figure 1; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09278282 A 19971028 (MIRAI IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |