EP1058078 - Condenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uehara, Haruo 1544-119, Ooaza-Kinryu, Kinryu-Machi Saga-shi Saga-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Uehara, Haruo 1544-119, Ooaza-Kinryu, Kinryu-Machi Saga-shi, Saga-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107482.2 | 06.04.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | JP19990152890 | 31.05.1999 Original published format: JP 15289099 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1058078 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1058078 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F28B1/00, F28F3/04, F28D9/00 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
F28F3/046 (EP,US);
F28B1/00 (EP,US);
F28B9/08 (EP,US);
F28D9/0037 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, SE [2002/51] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kondensator | [2000/49] | English: | Condenser | [2000/49] | French: | Condenseur | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 28.09.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT | 27.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/31] | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2587116 (JORIS DANIEL HEIJLIGERS, et al) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 8 - line 49; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2596642 (WILLIAM BOESTAD GUSTAV KARL) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 75; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2872165 (JOHAN WENNERBERG FRITZ) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 34; figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB1001673 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]US3631923 (IZEKI HAZIME); | [A]US3840070 (BECKER R, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 36 - column 7, line 24; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4180129 (SUMITOMO HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 63 - column 6, line 28; figures 1-11 *; | [X]US4182411 (DOI MASAFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 23 - column 7, line 65; figures 1-21 *; | [A]GB2040432 (HISAKA WORKS LTD); | [X]US4228850 (SUMITOMO HIROYUKI) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 61; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4230179 (UEHARA HARUO, et al); | [XA]US4314605 (SUMITOMO HIROYUKI, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 55; figures 1-8 * [A] 3-8; | [A]US4492268 (UEHARA HARUO [JP], et al); | [A]WO8801722 (FISCHER GERHARD [AT]) [A] 1-9 * page 10, line 3 - page 24, line 12; figures 1-13D *; | [A]EP0567393 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 45 - column 7, line 14; figures 1-6B * |